TN HB1290 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-07 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts persons licensed as instructors to teach the practice and theory of aesthetics, manicuring, barbering, or cosmetology from the course requirements necessary to practice as an aesthetician, manicurist, barber, or cosmetologist. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 62, Chapter 3 and Title 62, Chapter 4, relative to professions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-07HouseTaken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/7/2023
2023-02-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2023-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/28/2023
2023-02-08HouseAssigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1246 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback