TN HB1290 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the Municipal Energy Authority Act. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the Municipal Energy Authority Act. - Amends TCA Title 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 446 | |
2017-05-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-13 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1087 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 446