TN HB1287 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, beginning January 1, 2019, increases the minimum single policy limit, cash deposit, and bond amount required for proof of insurance under the Tennessee Financial Responsibility Law of 1977; authorizes a party in certain civil actions to obtain discovery of the contents of an automobile insurance agreement; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 5; Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, beginning January 1, 2019, increases the minimum single policy limit, cash deposit, and bond amount required for proof of insurance under the Tennessee Financial Responsibility Law of 1977; authorizes a party in certain civil actions to obtain discovery of the contents of an automobile insurance agreement; makes other related revisions. - Amends TCA Title 24, Chapter 5; Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Property & Casualty Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Casualty Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Casualty Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0427 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee