TN HB1286 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands the definition of action, for purposes of determining a cause of action, to include the filing of a lawsuit or demand for arbitration. - Amends TCA Title 28, Chapter 1.
Title
As introduced, expands the definition of action, for purposes of determining a cause of action, to include the filing of a lawsuit or demand for arbitration. - Amends TCA Title 28, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Meeting Adjourned |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0697 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-28 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.