TN HB1284 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises present law provisions regarding the examination to become licensed as a dentist. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 5, relative to dentistry.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-21 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476
2021-04-29HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-04-26HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/29/2021
2021-04-26HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-14HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021
2021-04-14HouseReset on Final cal. of Health Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23HouseAction Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021
2021-03-17HouseAssigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
2021-03-17HouseRef. to Health Committee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0702 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 476

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback