TN HB1283 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-19 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the ASVAB to be administered to all public school students in the 10th grade. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 4 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Title
As introduced, requires the ASVAB to be administered to all public school students in the 10th grade. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 4 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Subcommittee to 3/26/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Subcommittee for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1329 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-13 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1283&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1283.pdf |