TN HB1282 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces from 10 to five business days within which the commissioner of correction must provide a report to the senator and representative of a constituent in their district who died in the custody of the department at a department facility. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, reduces from 10 to five business days within which the commissioner of correction must provide a report to the senator and representative of a constituent in their district who died in the custody of the department at a department facility. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1031 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee