TN HB1280 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 43-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 9 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the governor, through the commissioner of finance and administration, to submit a waiver amendment to the centers for medicare and medicaid services to provide TennCare II funding by means of a block grant indexed for inflation and population growth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the governor, through the commissioner of finance and administration, to submit a waiver amendment to the centers for medicare and medicaid services to provide TennCare II funding by means of a block grant indexed for inflation and population growth. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 33; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 63 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY STEWART PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-14SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-10HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-02SenateConference Committee report adopted, Ayes 26, Nays 6
2019-05-02HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 63, Nays 19 PNV 1
2019-05-02HouseConf. comm. appointed. (T. Hill, Howell, Zachary)
2019-05-02SenateConference Committee appointed. (Bailey, Yarbro, Watson, Bell, Robinson)
2019-05-02HouseConf. comm. appointed. ( T.Hill, C.Sexton, Smith, Crawford, Hakeem)
2019-05-02HouseH. refused to recede from its non-concurrence
2019-05-02HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19
2019-05-01SenateSenate refused to recede from amendment 1
2019-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019
2019-04-30HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 24, Nays 5
2019-04-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0358)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-15SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-11HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-11HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 68, Nays 21, PNV 1
2019-04-11HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0032)
2019-04-11HouseAm. tabled. (Amendment 2 - HA0294)
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-26HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-03-13HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Insurance Committee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal TennCare Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c TennCare Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1428 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback