TN HB1276 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a local board of education that maintains an internet website and that establishes a program of school-based decision making that authorizes school personnel, including classroom teachers, to decide the school budget to post the adopted school budget on the board's website before the beginning of each school year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires a local board of education that maintains an internet website and that establishes a program of school-based decision making that authorizes school personnel, including classroom teachers, to decide the school budget to post the adopted school budget on the board's website before the beginning of each school year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-04-10 | House | Motion to recall from s/c failed in Education |
2019-04-02 | House | Failed in s/c Education Administration Subcommittee of Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1035 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee