TN HB1276 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds "businesses owned by persons with disabilities" to the Tennessee Minority-Owned, Woman-Owned and Small Business Procurement and Contracting Act; requires that the annual report made by the chief procurement officer concerning the awarding of purchases to minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, or small business and the total value of awards made also include the total dollar amount of purchases awarded to all businesses in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Title
As enacted, adds "businesses owned by persons with disabilities" to the Tennessee Minority-Owned, Woman-Owned and Small Business Procurement and Contracting Act; requires that the annual report made by the chief procurement officer concerning the awarding of purchases to minority-owned business, woman-owned business, service-disabled veteran-owned business, or small business and the total value of awards made also include the total dollar amount of purchases awarded to all businesses in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 12.
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Daniel [R] | Rep. Darren Jernigan [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Rep. Mike Stewart [D] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Pub. Ch. 485 | |
2017-06-14 | Effective date(s) 06/06/2017 | |
2017-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-11 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 24, Nays 2 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0330) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA0654) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0624) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0539) |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Sponsor change. |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1224 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485