TN HB1271 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. SB subst.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts from state and local taxation, all contributions or distributions made to, or on behalf of, participating students pursuant to any individualized education account (IEA). - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 14 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49, Chapter 10, Part 14 and Title 67, relative to taxation of individualized education accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-25HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/25/2021
2021-03-17HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021
2021-03-09HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Education Administration
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0127 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Transmitted to Governor for action.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback