TN HB1270 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 480
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires certain state agencies and political subdivisions to prepare and submit reports to the department of finance and administration regarding the effects of and plans for reductions in federal funding. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 9.
Title
As enacted, requires certain state agencies and political subdivisions to prepare and submit reports to the department of finance and administration regarding the effects of and plans for reductions in federal funding. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 480 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0455) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-19 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-18 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 87, Nays 7, PNV 1 |
2019-03-18 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0042) |
2019-03-18 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0090) |
2019-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Action def. in State Committee to 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. State Committee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-20 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0662 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 480