TN HB1265 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, enacts the "Fair Accountability and Clarity in Tax Subsidies Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, enacts the "Fair Accountability and Clarity in Tax Subsidies Act." - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-10HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-10HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0105)
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
2019-03-19HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-12HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 3/12/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Business Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0513 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-23 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
SB1293 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback