TN HB1263 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, establishes alternative provisions for creation and governance of regional transportation authorities. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, establishes alternative provisions for creation and governance of regional transportation authorities. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-17 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
2009-05-20 Comp. SB subst.
2009-05-19 Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/20/2009
2009-05-13 Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/19/2009
2009-05-12 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2009-05-06 Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 05/12/2009
2009-05-06 Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2009-04-29 Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009
2009-04-29 Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M
2009-04-29 Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2009-04-22 Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 04/29/2009
2009-04-21 Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Government Operations Committee
2009-04-15 Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 04/21/2009
2009-04-14 Action Def. in Transportation Committee to 4/21/2009
2009-04-08 Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 04/14/2009
2009-04-07 Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee
2009-04-01 Placed on s/c cal Public Safety of TR for 04/07/2009
2009-02-24 Assigned to s/c Public Safety of TR
2009-02-19 P2C, ref. to Transportation--Government Operations for review
2009-02-18 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-12 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1471 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 362

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback