TN HB1262 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 40-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 40-4)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 478
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, limits the professions to which the professional privilege tax applies to: lobbyists; persons licensed or registered under the laws governing securities as agents, broker-dealers, and investment advisers; physicians and osteopathic physicians; and attorneys; applicable to privilege taxes due and payable after May 31, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Title
As enacted, limits the professions to which the professional privilege tax applies to: lobbyists; persons licensed or registered under the laws governing securities as agents, broker-dealers, and investment advisers; physicians and osteopathic physicians; and attorneys; applicable to privilege taxes due and payable after May 31, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 193 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 452 of the Public Acts of 2017; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 478 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-17 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0458) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-05-01 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-05-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 10 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0507) |
2019-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0513) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar #2 for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-09 | House | Ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0398 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 478