TN HB1261 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Failed in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the department to establish a process by which the department will reimburse the parent of an economically disadvantaged student for fees and costs associated with taking one advanced placement examination that are not otherwise reimbursed, paid, or subsidized by any entity or program. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the department to establish a process by which the department will reimburse the parent of an economically disadvantaged student for fees and costs associated with taking one advanced placement examination that are not otherwise reimbursed, paid, or subsidized by any entity or program. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseFailed in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee of Education
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26HouseAction Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/19/2019
2019-03-05HouseAction Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/19/2019
2019-02-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/5/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Education
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0953 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback