TN HB1259 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 30 days to 25 days, the grace period in which a child care program must submit its annual report after receiving notice of its failure to do so. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 49 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 49 and Title 71, relative to child care.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Sparks [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1481 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-31 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee