TN HB1258 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes various changes to the process for restoration of voting rights, including consolidating the process for the issuance of a certificate of voting rights restoration through the secretary of state's office. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
As introduced, makes various changes to the process for restoration of voting rights, including consolidating the process for the issuance of a certificate of voting rights restoration through the secretary of state's office. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Sponsors
Rep. Vincent Dixie [D] | Rep. Harold Love [D] | Rep. Yusuf Hakeem [D] | Rep. Jesse Chism [D] |
Rep. John Clemmons [D] | Rep. Gloria Johnson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee of Judiciary |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Constitutional Protections & Sentencing Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0875 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee