TN HB1254 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the state or any executive branch state agency from entering into a contract for goods or services or awarding grants or tax subsidies to a business entity that engages in discrimination on the basis of second amendment-related activity. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the state or any executive branch state agency from entering into a contract for goods or services or awarding grants or tax subsidies to a business entity that engages in discrimination on the basis of second amendment-related activity. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1228 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee