TN HB1254 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enumerates certain state officials and employees who are included within the definition of "official" in the executive branch or "official" in the legislative branch for purposes of the lobbying provisions of the Tennessee Ethics Commission Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, enumerates certain state officials and employees who are included within the definition of "official" in the executive branch or "official" in the legislative branch for purposes of the lobbying provisions of the Tennessee Ethics Commission Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c State Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c State Government of S&LG to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal State Government of S&LG for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c State Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0748 (Crossfiled) 2009-04-14 - Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1254&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1254.pdf |