TN HB1253 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 147
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department of correction to advance or reimburse witness expenses necessary to the prosecution of certain criminal cases; requires the county to seek to recover from a convicted defendant who is declared not to be indigent, the costs of the advance or reimbursement of witness expenses made by the department of correction. - Amends TCA Section 40-25-129.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 40-25-129, relative to witnesses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 147
2023-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-23HouseComp. SB subst.
2023-03-16HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2023
2023-03-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2023
2023-03-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2023-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/14/2023
2023-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0476 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Effective date(s) 04/13/2023

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback