TN HB1251 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local law enforcement officials to submit all human biological specimens to TBI for testing as promptly as possible after collecting the specimens and directs TBI to establish a DNA testing fee schedule with the lowest fee for those officers who submit the specimen within 10 days of collection. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires local law enforcement officials to submit all human biological specimens to TBI for testing as promptly as possible after collecting the specimens and directs TBI to establish a DNA testing fee schedule with the lowest fee for those officers who submit the specimen within 10 days of collection. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1319 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1251&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1251.pdf |