TN HB1248 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Connect Tennessee Act," which directs the comptroller of the treasury to deliver the annual report on the status of the provision of broadband services by telecommunications joint ventures to the chairs of the business and utilities committee of the house and the commerce and labor committee of the senate rather than the entire general assembly; changes the due date for the report from January 31 to February 28. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 48 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Connect Tennessee Act," which directs the comptroller of the treasury to deliver the annual report on the status of the provision of broadband services by telecommunications joint ventures to the chairs of the business and utilities committee of the house and the commerce and labor committee of the senate rather than the entire general assembly; changes the due date for the report from January 31 to February 28. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 6; Title 7; Title 13; Title 48 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1348 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1248&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1248.pdf |