TN HB1245 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-17 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows for a sentence of death to be carried out by electrocution as an alternative to lethal injection if the commissioner of correction certifies to the governor that the department is unable to adhere to the lethal injection protocol required to carry out the sentence of death. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 23.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 23, relative to the death penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/16/2024 |
2024-04-03 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2024-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2024 |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2024 |
2023-04-18 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024