TN HB1245 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 70-6)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 70-6)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $10,000 to $30,000 the civil penalty amount per violation that the attorney general and reporter may recover in an action against a person who commits the offense of caller identification spoofing; encourages carriers offering telephone services in this state to adopt certain technologies and measures. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.
Title
As enacted, increases from $10,000 to $30,000 the civil penalty amount per violation that the attorney general and reporter may recover in an action against a person who commits the offense of caller identification spoofing; encourages carriers offering telephone services in this state to adopt certain technologies and measures. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 217 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/23/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0246) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-04-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0093) |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/13/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0754 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 217