TN HB1245 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 70-6)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 217
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases from $10,000 to $30,000 the civil penalty amount per violation that the attorney general and reporter may recover in an action against a person who commits the offense of caller identification spoofing; encourages carriers offering telephone services in this state to adopt certain technologies and measures. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, increases from $10,000 to $30,000 the civil penalty amount per violation that the attorney general and reporter may recover in an action against a person who commits the offense of caller identification spoofing; encourages carriers offering telephone services in this state to adopt certain technologies and measures. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.

Sponsors

Rep. David Byrd [R]Rep. Mike Sparks [R]Rep. Jerry Sexton [R]Rep. Dan Howell [R]
Rep. Dale Carr [R]Rep. John Crawford [R]Rep. Kelly Keisling [R]Rep. Bob Ramsey [R]
Rep. Bud Hulsey [R]Rep. Timothy Hill [R]Rep. Rush Bricken [R]Rep. Dave Wright [R]
Rep. Kent Calfee [R]Rep. Rick Eldridge [R]Rep. Sabi Kumar [R]Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R]
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R]Rep. Brandon Ogles [R]Rep. Chris Hurt [R]Rep. Johnny Shaw [D]
Rep. David Hawk [R]Rep. Jeremy Faison [R]Rep. Martin Daniel [R]Rep. Debra Moody [R]
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R]Rep. Mark Cochran [R]Rep. Bill Sanderson [R]Rep. Clay Doggett [R]
Rep. Clark Boyd [R]Rep. Susan Lynn [R]Rep. Curtis Johnson [R]Rep. Mary Littleton [R]
Rep. John Windle [D]Rep. Andy Holt [R]Rep. Bill Dunn [R]Rep. Thomas Tillis [R]
Rep. Sam Whitson [R]Rep. Kirk Haston [R]Rep. Bruce Griffey [R]Rep. John Ragan [R]
Rep. Tim Rudd [R]Rep. James Van Huss [R]Rep. Iris Rudder [R]Rep. Ryan Williams [R]
Rep. Paul Sherrell [R]Rep. Jay Reedy [R]Rep. Mike Carter [R]Rep. Robin Smith [R]
Rep. Gregory Terry [R]Rep. Kevin Vaughan [R]Rep. Chris Todd [R]Rep. Ron Travis [R]
Rep. Pat Marsh [R]Rep. Mark White [R]Rep. Jerome Moon [R]Rep. John Holsclaw [R]
Rep. Rick Staples [D]Rep. William Lamberth [R]Rep. Justin Lafferty [R]Rep. Dennis Powers [R]
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R]Rep. Curtis Halford [R]Rep. Ron Gant [R]Rep. Cameron Sexton [R]
Rep. Michael Curcio [R]Rep. Andrew Farmer [R]Rep. Mark Hall [R]Rep. Charlie Baum [R]
Rep. Lowell Russell [R]Rep. Esther Helton [R]Rep. Gary Hicks [R]Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R]
Rep. John DeBerry [D]Rep. Antonio Parkinson [D]Rep. Glen Casada [R]Rep. Jason Hodges [D]

Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 217
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 04/23/2019
2019-04-23 Signed by Governor.
2019-04-16HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-11HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-10HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-08SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-04-08SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0246)
2019-04-08SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-02HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-01HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 2
2019-04-01HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0093)
2019-03-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019
2019-03-18HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-13HousePlaced on cal. Consumer and Human Resources Committee for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Consumer Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Consumer Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0754 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 217

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback