TN HB1244 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Local School District Empowerment Act"; allows for the establishment of the office of elected superintendent of schools; adjusts duties of local boards of education in school systems in which the office of elected superintendent of schools is established. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the office of elected superintendent of schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0910 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-01 - Failed in Senate Education Committee