TN HB1239 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits the commissioner of the department of correction and a local governmental entity from entering into, renewing, or extending a contract for correctional services with a private prison contractor; deletes the Private Prison Contracting Act of 1986 upon the expiration of all such contracts. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 41.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 9; Title 12 and Title 41, relative to private prison contractors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10HouseSponsor change.
2024-01-10HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2023-04-10HouseSponsor change.
2023-03-21HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Corrections Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2023-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Corrections Subcommittee for 3/21/2023
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Corrections Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1515 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback