TN HB1238 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires verification of United States citizenship or lawful presence for each applicant 18 years of age or older, who applies for prenatal care administered by the department of health and the special supplemental food program for women, infants and children administered by the department of health. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12; Title 33; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires verification of United States citizenship or lawful presence for each applicant 18 years of age or older, who applies for prenatal care administered by the department of health and the special supplemental food program for women, infants and children administered by the department of health. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 12; Title 33; Title 39; Title 40; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseFailed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary
2019-03-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/13/2019
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-03-05HouseRef. to Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1279 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback