TN HB1234 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-10 - Sponsor change.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer to use only an appropriately marked law enforcement vehicle to make traffic stops in non-emergency situations; defines an appropriately marked law enforcement vehicle as one that bears insignias, stripes, decals, labels, seals, symbols, or other pictorial signs or lettering indicating the vehicle's identity as a law enforcement vehicle used by a particular law enforcement agency. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 55, relative to the operation of law enforcement vehicles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-01-10HouseSponsor change.
2024-01-10HouseSponsor(s) withdrawn.
2023-04-10HouseSponsor change.
2023-02-07HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2023-02-02HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1497 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback