TN HB1233 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Accommodations for All Children Act." - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the Tennessee Accommodations for All Children Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 70 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 452 | |
2021-05-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-27 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. SA1 Ayes 70, Nays 22 PNV 0 HB1233 |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/26/21 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 23, Nays 7, PNV 3 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0140) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-20 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 65, Nays 24, PNV 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0086) |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1367 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 452