TN HB1230 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 345
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, updates references to house committee names; requires that house speaker be given a copy of all reports required to be submitted to the general assembly, the house of representatives, or a house committee; specifies that the rules of each house control as to appropriate committee to which a report must be submitted or before which a party is to appear in situations where the committee name may differ from what appears in TCA due to a rule change. - Amends TCA and Chapter 865 of the Public Acts of 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, updates references to house committee names; requires that house speaker be given a copy of all reports required to be submitted to the general assembly, the house of representatives, or a house committee; specifies that the rules of each house control as to appropriate committee to which a report must be submitted or before which a party is to appear in situations where the committee name may differ from what appears in TCA due to a rule change. - Amends TCA and Chapter 865 of the Public Acts of 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Pub. Ch. 345
2019-05-15 Effective date(s) 05/10/2019
2019-05-10 Signed by Governor.
2019-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-01SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-25HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-04-24SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-04-24SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-10HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-10HousePassed H., Ayes 84, Nays 0, PNV 3
2019-04-04HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/2/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to State Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1234 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback