TN HB1228 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Def. to Summer Study in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-23 - Def. to Summer Study in K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows county or city school districts to reestablish the office of elected school superintendent and outlines the qualifications of an elected superintendent. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to reestablishment of the office of elected school superintendent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Def. to Summer Study in K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1010 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-24 - Sponsor(s) Added.