TN HB1227 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Pub. Ch. 554
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that a school may satisfy the summer programming requirement for qualification for a community schools grant by providing four weeks of summer programming during consecutive or nonconsecutive weeks. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Title
As enacted, clarifies that a school may satisfy the summer programming requirement for qualification for a community schools grant by providing four weeks of summer programming during consecutive or nonconsecutive weeks. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Pub. Ch. 554 | |
2018-03-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2018 | |
2018-03-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2018-03-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2018-03-01 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 97, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1227 |
2018-02-27 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/1/2018 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0561) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1065 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554