TN HB1220 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives to electronically transmit the written report that must be submitted to the speakers of the house of representatives and the senate, and to the commissioner of finance and administration and the comptroller of the treasury, regarding the extent of allocations from the increases in the funds required to provide the state's share of the funding of any municipality expenditure increase or county government expenditure increase. - Amends TCA Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 3; Title 4; Title 9 and Title 67, relative to state finances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1588 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee