TN HB1218 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Failed for lack of second in: Business Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Failed for lack of second in: Business Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the reinstatement of professional and occupational licenses under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 32; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the reinstatement of professional and occupational licenses under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 32; Title 62; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Potts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | Failed for lack of second in: Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0999 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second