TN HB1218 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the allocation of state or local public funds, personnel or property to the regulation or enforcement of any federal law, executive order, rule or regulation, or any treaty signed by the United States, that becomes effective on or after January 1, 2013, that imposes restrictions on citizens who lawfully possess or carry firearms in this state. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the allocation of state or local public funds, personnel or property to the regulation or enforcement of any federal law, executive order, rule or regulation, or any treaty signed by the United States, that becomes effective on or after January 1, 2013, that imposes restrictions on citizens who lawfully possess or carry firearms in this state. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | P1C. |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro. |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0795 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-17 - Notice to Recall from Comm. Filed
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1218&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1218.pdf |