TN HB1218 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-03 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the transfer of a juvenile from juvenile to adult court if the juvenile commits an aggravated assault against an employee of a juvenile detention facility to which the juvenile has been committed or is confined. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the transfer of a juvenile from juvenile to adult court if the juvenile commits an aggravated assault against an employee of a juvenile detention facility to which the juvenile has been committed or is confined. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 1, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Judiciary Committee | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-19 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/26/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2000 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.