TN HB1218 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a mechanism for local governmental units to purchase goods and services through a competitive reverse auction process after filing a plan with the comptroller to document internal controls to ensure the integrity of the process. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 10.
Title
As introduced, creates a mechanism for local governmental units to purchase goods and services through a competitive reverse auction process after filing a plan with the comptroller to document internal controls to ensure the integrity of the process. - Amends TCA Title 12, Chapter 3, Part 10.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Local Government of S&LG of State & Local Government Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Local Government of S&LG for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1412 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-25 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1218&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1218.pdf |