TN HB1214 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee emergency medical services board to study, on or before January 31, 2018, the practice of mobile integrated health care by emergency medical services personnel and its relationship to community paramedicine and report its findings and recommendations to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As introduced, requires the Tennessee emergency medical services board to study, on or before January 31, 2018, the practice of mobile integrated health care by emergency medical services personnel and its relationship to community paramedicine and report its findings and recommendations to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1161 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee