TN HB1214 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-01 - Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the number of days for an inspection of a footer to be considered performed timely from inspection within one working day of when the request is made to the inspector, to three working days. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As introduced, increases the number of days for an inspection of a footer to be considered performed timely from inspection within one working day of when the request is made to the inspector, to three working days. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Doss [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Business and Utilities Committee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business and Utilities Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1283 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1214&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1214.pdf |