TN HB1212 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Def. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department of revenue to establish an uninsured vehicle diversion program; allows the department of revenue to utilize vehicle recognition systems to identify violations of the Financial Responsibility Law and assess fees for participation in the diversion program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 9; Title 55 and Title 56.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 9; Title 55 and Title 56, relative to motor vehicle insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13HouseDef. to Summer Study in Insurance Subcommittee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 4/13/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance Committee -- Government Operations for Review
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1571 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Deferred to Summer Study

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback