TN HB1209 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 484
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that any person treated for a drug-related overdose with an opioid antagonist by a first responder be taken to a medical facility by emergency medical services for evaluation, unless the person is competent to refuse medical treatment and chooses to refuse treatment. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that any person treated for a drug-related overdose with an opioid antagonist by a first responder be taken to a medical facility by emergency medical services for evaluation, unless the person is competent to refuse medical treatment and chooses to refuse treatment. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Harris (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 2 (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Pub. Ch. 484
2017-06-14 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-06-06 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-30HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-12HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-10HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 2 Ayes 79, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-05-10SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 1
2017-05-10SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0551)
2017-05-10SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-05-08HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-08HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 84, Nays 2, PNV 0
2017-05-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/8/2017
2017-05-04HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2017-05-04HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0525)
2017-05-04HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0315)
2017-05-03HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-02HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-25HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/25/2017
2017-04-18HouseAction def. in Health Committee to 4/25/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/18/2017
2017-04-05HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
2017-02-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0669 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 484

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback