TN HB1207 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the department of health to identify high-risk prescribers; requires the commissioner of health to report certain information concerning births involving neonatal abstinence syndrome and opioid use by women of childbearing age; requires bureau of TennCare to issue appropriate requests for information for program initiatives aimed at primary prevention and secondary prevention of births involving neonatal abstinence syndrome and the use of opioids by women of childbearing age enrolled in the TennCare program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, requires the department of health to identify high-risk prescribers; requires the commissioner of health to report certain information concerning births involving neonatal abstinence syndrome and opioid use by women of childbearing age; requires bureau of TennCare to issue appropriate requests for information for program initiatives aimed at primary prevention and secondary prevention of births involving neonatal abstinence syndrome and the use of opioids by women of childbearing age enrolled in the TennCare program. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 53; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 3 (Y: 71 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-14 | Pub. Ch. 483 | |
2017-06-14 | Effective date(s) 06/06/2017 | |
2017-06-06 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-30 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-12 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-10 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3. Ayes 71, Nays 7 PNV 1 |
2017-05-10 | House | Motion to reconsider Non-concurrence adopted. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-05-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0482) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. (Amendment 1 - SA0482) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0521) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. (Amendment 2 - SA0521) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Tabling Motion Lifted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1,2 and 3 HB1207 |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/10/2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - SA0533) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0525) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0521) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0482) |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-04 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0562) |
2017-05-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0598) |
2017-05-04 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0385) |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Health Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee-- Health |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1041 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 483