TN HB1207 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, subjects humane societies that make arrests to the supervision of local sheriffs; prohibits humane societies from making arrests in counties with government animal control agencies; restricts the authority of humane societies to place a lien against owners of animals found at large. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 44, Chapter 17 and Title 63, Chapter 12.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, subjects humane societies that make arrests to the supervision of local sheriffs; prohibits humane societies from making arrests in counties with government animal control agencies; restricts the authority of humane societies to place a lien against owners of animals found at large. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14; Title 44, Chapter 17 and Title 63, Chapter 12.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-02HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
2016-01-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/2/2016
2015-03-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2016
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2015
2015-03-17HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2015
2015-03-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2015
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2015-02-23HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee--Agriculture
2015-02-18HouseP1C.
2015-02-12HouseIntro.
2015-02-12HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0931 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback