TN HB1204 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing special sales and use tax allocation in regard to minor league baseball stadium. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Zachary [R] | Rep. Eddie Mannis [R] | Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] |
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Sam McKenzie [D] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Jerome Moon [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] |
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] | Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Gary Hicks [R] | Rep. Mark Cochran [R] | Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
Rep. Charlie Baum [R] | Rep. William Lamberth [R] | Rep. Sam Whitson [R] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] |
Rep. Ron Gant [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Mark White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 71 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 422 | |
2021-05-12 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0135) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0398) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-27 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 71, Nays 10, PNV 8 |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-27 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0406) |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to Sports Facility Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0783 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 422