TN HB1202 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a member of the health services and development agency to attend an agency meeting by remote electronic means if health-related reasons or other good cause prevent the member from in-person attendance; requires member to send prior written notice to the executive director; deems a member attending an agency meeting by such means as attending in-person for purposes of establishing a quorum. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to certificates of need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1394 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee