TN HB1199 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends eligibility for receipt of Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students who are attending certain independent postsecondary institutions and who are otherwise eligible for the grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, extends eligibility for receipt of Wilder-Naifeh technical skills grants to students who are attending certain independent postsecondary institutions and who are otherwise eligible for the grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-26 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 5/26/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Meeting Canceled. Reset on Higher Education Subcommittee cal. for 3/10/20 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2019-04-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee of Education |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | No Action Taken |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Def. to Summer Lottery Calendar |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0977 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee