TN HB1196 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, sets venue for actions challenging the constitutionality of a state statute, executive order, or administrative rule or regulation in the county where the plaintiff resides or, if the plaintiff is not a resident of Tennessee, in Sumner County. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 10; Title 13; Title 20; Title 27 and Title 57.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 10; Title 13; Title 20; Title 27 and Title 57, relative to venue for certain actions against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 62 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 69, Nays 21, PNV 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0122) |
2021-04-01 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0454 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee