TN HB1194 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Pub. Ch. 138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a board of education to allow a student who is the dependent child of a member of the United States armed forces and who does not reside within the boundaries of the school district to enroll in a public school within the school district under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, requires a board of education to allow a student who is the dependent child of a member of the United States armed forces and who does not reside within the boundaries of the school district to enroll in a public school within the school district under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Wright [R] | Rep. Mark White [R] | Rep. Lowell Russell [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Rep. Jerome Moon [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | Pub. Ch. 138 | |
2019-04-15 | Effective date(s) 04/09/2019 | |
2019-04-09 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/4/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2019 |
2019-02-27 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 2/27/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1197 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 138